Trustees WESTWOOD FARM COMMUNITY PRE-SCHOOL

Charity Number: 294802
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Marie-Clare Faulks Chair 29 November 2023
None on record
Abbie Rapley Trustee 18 March 2024
None on record
David Michael Williamson Trustee 22 January 2024
None on record
Colin Talbot Trustee 18 October 2023
None on record
Laura Longmate Trustee 18 October 2023
None on record
Talisa Needhan Trustee 18 January 2023
None on record
Richard William Roger Churchill Trustee 04 January 2023
None on record
Elizabeth Hobley Trustee 15 November 2021
None on record