Financial history THE CRY-SIS HELPLINE

Charity number: 295470
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £13.68k £12.67k £4.23k £2.36k £3.80k
Total expenditure £7.80k £7.40k £7.36k £6.74k £5.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A