CHARITY OF WILLIAM WESTLEY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trustees shall apply the income in promoting the education of young persons resident in Whittlesford either by providing such special benefits of any kind not normally provided by the local education authority for the William Westley School as may from time to time be agreed between the Trustees and the Governors of the School or in such other ways as the Trustees think fit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 10 April 1987: Standard registration
- 09 September 2013: Removed (Does not operate)
- 05 October 2013: Re-registered
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Olivia Mary Kana Coles | Chair | 10 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR JOHN STANLEY HILL GASTON | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Hannah Catherine Gavin | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Chloe Felicia Landucci | Trustee | 29 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lionel Ginsberg | Trustee | 05 May 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.13k | £731 | £1.23k | £999 | £1.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £5.14k | £821 | £917 | £1.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 7TH AUGUST 1986
Charitable objects
(1) A YEARLY SUM OF 75P TO THE VICAR OR PRIEST IN CHARGE FOR THE TIME BEING OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY AND ST ANDREW, WHITTLESFORD FOR PREACHING A SERMON IN THAT ECCESIASTICAL PARISH ON THE SUNDAY NEAREST THE 13TH JULY IN EACH YEAR. (2) PROMOTING THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PERSONS RESIDENT IN WHITTLESFORD EITHER BY PROVIDING SUCH SPECIAL BENEFITS OF ANY KIND NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY FOR THE WILLIAM WESTLEY SCHOOL AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE AGREED BETWEEN THE TRUSTEES AND THE GOVERNORS OR THE SCHOOL AFTER CONSULTATION WITH THE SAID AUTHORITY OR IN SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT. IN ALLOCATING BENEFITS IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PROVISIONS OF THE LAST PRECEDING SUB-CLAUSE THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE REGARD FOR THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES AND DOCTRINES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND.
Area of benefit
WHITTLESFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 ASCHAM LANE
WHITTLESFORD
CAMBRIDGE
CB22 4NT
- Phone:
- 01223832176
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window