Financial history CASTLEHAVEN COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 295829
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.09m £1.01m £1.33m £984.53k £798.92k
Total expenditure £1.27m £891.65k £1.03m £1.00m £925.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £161.79k £137.49k
Income from government grants £121.83k £139.01k £107.00k £188.48k £313.21k
Income - Donations and legacies £452.85k £587.96k £414.02k £62.28k £735.56k
Income - Other trading activities £632.80k £422.36k £916.20k £0 £30.99k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £35.04k £7.03k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £426 £0 £0 £532.07k £25.34k
Income - Other £0 £119 £61 £4.88k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £30.00k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £626.74k £447.18k £492.19k £642.57k £847.50k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £440.62k £534.07k £359.83k £3.60k
Expenditure - Governance £4.45k £0 £0 £3.60k £25.53k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £647.34k £3.85k £3.85k £0 £74.73k