WESSEX CHRISTIAN CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the evangelical christian faith and evangelical christian charitable institutions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Bournemouth
- Dorset
- Hampshire
Governance
- 04 March 1988: Standard registration
- 20 August 2021: Removed (Does not operate)
- 20 August 2021: Funds transferred to 1050248 DISCOVER CHURCH
No other names
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.79k | £65.88k | £29.54k | £26.96k | £8.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.17k | £51.15k | £40.34k | £30.39k | £6.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 June 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 05 July 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 17 January 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 04 September 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 10 September 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 22ND DECEMBER 1986
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE EVANGELICAL CHRISTIAN FAITH AND EVANGELICAL CHRISTIAN CHARITABLE INSTIUTIONS AND FOR THIS PURPOSE THE EVANGELICAL CHRISTIAN FAITH SHALL MEAN A BELIEF IN THE FUNDAMENTAL TRUTHS OF CHRISTIANITY AS TAUGHT IN THE BIBLE BOTH OLD AND NEW TESTAMENTS WHICH IS ACCEPTED AS INSPIRED AND AUTHORITATIVE IN ALL MATTERS OF FAITH AND PRACTICE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window