Financial history THE FRENCH PORCELAIN SOCIETY

Charity number: 296085
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £39.30k £32.05k £29.78k £44.26k £37.28k
Total expenditure £27.05k £29.85k £23.46k £48.57k £28.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A