Financial history WELLFIELD TRUST

Charity number: 296205
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £73.83k £66.48k £74.39k £74.78k £75.62k
Total expenditure £68.06k £61.69k £72.36k £76.15k £66.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £2.00k N/A N/A