Financial history BUCKLAND BREWER HALL

Charity number: 297685
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £21.73k £22.61k £14.47k £14.08k £16.26k
Total expenditure £5.95k £6.99k £13.35k £16.22k £9.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.95k £19.71k £4.86k £2.00k N/A