Trustees BUCKLAND BREWER HALL
Charity number: 297685

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Roger Walter | Chair | 23 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Miles | Trustee | 20 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Betty Florence Walter Banks | Trustee | 20 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Barry Noakes | Trustee | 21 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Robin Geoffrey Davies | Trustee | 27 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Richard Watson | Trustee | 23 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Babb | Trustee | 07 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
KEVIN GEORGE LOBB | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TREVOR MILLS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAWN DZIURZYNSKI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID COURTNEY WATSON | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.