Trustees BEARSTED DISTRICT GUIDE ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 297749
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Shan Elizabeth Lythgoe Chair
None on record
Helen Bingham Rowe Trustee 15 January 2021
None on record
Sarah Jayne Campbell-Smith Trustee 13 January 2021
None on record
Sophia Elizabeth Looney Trustee 03 September 2020
PARTICIPATORY CITY FOUNDATION
Received: 15 days late
TEAM PHOENIX FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Susan Elizabeth Agassiz Trustee 03 September 2020
None on record
Emma Claire Jeffery Trustee 03 September 2020
None on record
Rebecca Jane Barford-Evans Trustee 01 September 2016
None on record
Feriel Janet Friend Trustee 09 January 2012
None on record
Tracey Jean Biggs Trustee 09 January 2012
None on record