THE AMERICAN QUARTER HORSE ASSOCIATION UK LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
This company is membership based and actively promotes Horse Sport and recreational activities with emphasis on training our Youth to compete Internationally e.g. Europe and U.S.A. These youth events are held annually. We also make donations to horse related charities e.g. Animal Health Trust.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 19 January 1988: Standard registration
- AQHA UK (Working name)
- THE AMERICAN QUARTER HORSE ASSN UK (Working name)
- BRITISH QUARTER HORSE ASSOCIATION LTD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicholas Ainley MBE | Chair | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Margaret Miller | Trustee | 08 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Clare Emma Hatchard | Trustee | 08 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Tamarind Iona Greaves | Trustee | 11 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sandra May Loder | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Leigh Cheetham | Trustee | 14 October 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £74.81k | £29.37k | £62.70k | £63.00k | £52.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £71.19k | £25.56k | £53.90k | £57.72k | £51.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14TH OCTOBER 1975, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 2ND NOVEMBER 1987, 12TH OCTOBER 1990 AND AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 10TH NOVEMBER 1997 as amended on 22 May 2023
Charitable objects
TO ENCOURAGE, PROMOTE AND IMPROVE THE BREEDING OF AMERICAN QUARTER HORSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN IRELAND, OR ELSEWHERE, AND WITH A VIEW THERETO IF AND SO FAR AS MAY BE SO THOUGHT FIT, TO PURCHASE, IMPORT, BREED, HIRE OR OTHERWISE DEAL IN AMERICAN QUARTER HORSES WHETHER OF BRITISH OR FOREIGN ORIGIN.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 6
Heritage Business Centre
Derby Road
Belper
Derbyshire
- Phone:
- 07544262747
- Email:
- info@aqha.uk.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window