Trustees THE CORNWALL BEEKEEPERS' ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 298470

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Clair Harwood | Chair | 26 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Ann Forsyth | Trustee | 05 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Chris Marshall | Trustee | 05 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Arthur Day | Trustee | 06 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Robin Martin | Trustee | 06 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen John Carter | Trustee | 25 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clive Grainger | Trustee | 25 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Neill John Darling | Trustee | 25 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martin Falkner | Trustee | 25 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dale Philip Wood | Trustee | 25 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Richard Hine | Trustee | 26 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Singh | Trustee | 25 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mary Ann Hardman | Trustee | 16 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Barrington Hardman | Trustee | 16 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Vanessa Janet Tyler | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Godden | Trustee | 10 March 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.