Financial history THE ST ALBANS CATHEDRAL EDUCATION TRUST

Charity number: 299317
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £57.48k £45.97k £44.01k £60.26k £57.99k
Total expenditure £64.23k £41.68k £42.60k £55.75k £67.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A