Trustees THE ST ALBANS CATHEDRAL EDUCATION TRUST
Charity number: 299317

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KATHRYN BIRSS | Chair | 17 February 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Sylvia Lucy Chong-Tai | Trustee | 19 March 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Professor Quintin McKellar | Trustee | 19 March 2025 |
|
|||||||
Dr Banita Lal | Trustee | 19 March 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Patrick Moriarty | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|||||||
THE VERY REVD JOANNE KELLY-MOORE | Trustee | 04 December 2021 |
|
|||||||
Lucy Deborah Hinchliffe | Trustee | 28 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||
RORY TAPNER | Trustee | 06 November 2017 |
|
|
||||||
ROSALIND HARDY | Trustee | 11 November 2014 |
|
|
||||||
KEVIN ANTHONY WALTON | Trustee | 18 November 2008 |
|
|
||||||
DR MIKE NEWELL | Trustee | 04 March 2008 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.