The Jungle Hut Preschool

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide high quality, affordable and accessible childcare for all children aged two-five years, in a safe and supportive environment and to work with parents in the provision of this childcare.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £51,393 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Dorset
Governance
- 08 June 1988: Standard registration
- The Jungle Hut Pre-school (Working name)
- MARNHULL PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- MARNHULL PRESCHOOL (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ebony Brennan | Chair | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Spice | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Bosley | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Laurie Shea Mrs | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.39k | £54.19k | £57.63k | £61.96k | £68.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.92k | £39.55k | £63.18k | £77.75k | £50.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £39.86k | £46.48k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £36.96k | £7.24k | N/A | £34.50k | £51.39k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 January 2025 | 70 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 January 2025 | 70 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 January 2024 | 86 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2022
(These accounts |
25 January 2024 | 86 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 12 February 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18TH MARCH 1988 AND AMENDED 22ND SEPTEMBER 1988 as amended on 05 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN BELOW COMPLUSORY SCHOOL AGE BY:- (A) PROVIDING SAFE AND SATISFYING GROUP PLAY, IN WHICH PARENTS HAVE THE RIGHT TO TAKE PART. (B) ENCOURAGING OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES THROUGH WHICH PARENTS MAY HELP THE CHILDREN. (C) FUTHERING THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUPS ASSOICATION.
Area of benefit
MARNHULL AREA AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
NEW STREET
MARNHULL
STURMINSTER NEWTON
DORSET
DT10 1PZ
- Phone:
- 01258 820096
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window