Financial history THE KINGFISHER (ESSEX) CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 299858
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £23.70k £19.37k £21.69k £23.70k £21.60k
Total expenditure £26.22k £25.83k £14.89k £13.78k £24.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A