Trustees NAPHILL VILLAGE HALL AND PLAYING FIELDS
Charity number: 300309

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CLIVE LAWRENCE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Rob McMurray | Trustee | 07 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jason Fletcher | Trustee | 07 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
DAVID EVANS | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bartha Elizabeth Pitman | Trustee | 04 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Tench | Trustee | 04 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
DARREN LOMAS | Trustee | 07 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Keattch | Trustee | 06 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter Williams | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Linda Clark | Trustee | 04 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
TANYA STEVENS | Trustee | 06 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
PAUL RIGLAR | Trustee | 04 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Gloria Mildred Leflaive | Trustee | 09 April 2002 |
|
|
||||
SARAH BACON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR ANDREW WASILEWSKI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CATHRYN CARTER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.