Financial history BRAY AND HOLYPORT SCOUT GROUP

Charity Number: 300489
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £9.10k £21.39k £9.17k £12.60k £12.53k
Total expenditure £9.92k £9.22k £14.40k £13.44k £15.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £19.43k N/A N/A N/A