Financial history 1ST CHALFONT ST GILES SCOUT GROUP

Charity Number: 300662
Charity reporting is up to date (42 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 30/03/2022 30/03/2023 30/03/2024
Total gross income £56.21k £37.79k £38.14k £36.98k £136.10k
Total expenditure £49.67k £19.14k £52.41k £26.40k £116.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £19.77k £8.00k N/A £76.50k