26TH CAMBRIDGE SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 300712
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The aim of the Association is to promote the development of young people in achieving their full physical, intellectual, social and spiritual potential, as individuals, as responsible citizens and as members of their local, national and international communities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £10,003
Total expenditure: £16,928

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Cambridgeshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 June 1971: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • 26TH CAMBRIDGE GROUP (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
The Scout Association Trustee
1ST PENYCAE SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
1ST TETTENHALL WOOD SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
ST JOHN'S, PERRY BARR, 236TH BIRMINGHAM SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
15TH REIGATE (CHIPSTEAD) SCOUT GROUP
Received: 2 days late
1ST CORNELLY SCOUT AND GUIDE HALL MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE
Charity reporting is overdue by 1563 days

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £6.64k £5.07k £9.31k £8.35k £10.00k
Total expenditure £3.62k £2.30k £6.76k £9.95k £16.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 05 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 05 October 2024 158 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 05 October 2024 524 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 07 November 2022 191 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 07 November 2022 556 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
26TH CAMBRIDGE SCOUT GROUP
THE SCOUT CENTRE
LOGANS WAY
CAMBRIDGE
CB4 1BL
Phone:
0122364040
Email:
No information available