CAMBRIDGESHIRE EAST GUIDES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Girlguiding, as part of a worldwide Movement, enables young girls and women to fulfil their potential to take an active and responsible role in society through a programme of activities delivered by trained volunteer leaders.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
920 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 22 May 1967: Standard registration
- CAMBS EAST GUIDES (Working name)
- GIRLGUIDING CAMBRIDGESHIRE EAST (Working name)
- CAMBRIDGE AND THE ISLE OF ELY BRANCH OF THE GIRL GUIDES ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- CAMBRIDGESHIRE EAST GIRL GUIDES (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Claire Adams | Chair | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Linda Tilbrook | Trustee | 12 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lindsey Eldridge | Trustee | 06 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Carpenter | Trustee | 28 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
DEANNA RAVEN | Trustee | 28 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Ellen Tack | Trustee | 29 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Stevens | Trustee | 12 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Anderson | Trustee | 06 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kate Willetts | Trustee | 24 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tina Walker | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Hallworth | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA MAY BETTS | Trustee | 08 May 2017 |
|
|||||
Lisa Elaine King | Trustee | 08 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £170.49k | £107.07k | £116.37k | £205.85k | £181.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £161.10k | £92.78k | £116.72k | £203.99k | £142.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £12.12k | £17.91k | £5.87k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 14/12/1922
Charitable objects
UNIT OF THE GIRL GUIDES ASSOCIATION
Area of benefit
AS DEFINED BY MAP FORMING PART OF THE OFFICIAL YEARBOOK FROM TIME TO TIME BY THE GUIDE ASSOCIATION
Contact information
- Address:
-
COUNTY OFFICE
3 QUY COURT
COLLIERS LANE
STOW-CUM-QUY
CAMBRIDGE
CB25 9AU
- Phone:
- 01223813917
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window