Financial history Carrick District Scout Council

Charity number: 300742
Charity reporting is up to date (86 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £51.85k £37.05k £30.41k £57.92k £54.15k
Total expenditure £38.20k £34.01k £32.00k £36.19k £76.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £20.20k £8.00k N/A N/A