Financial history BRATTON FLEMING VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 300777
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £14.19k £18.91k £13.10k £22.35k £21.24k
Total expenditure £13.88k £11.78k £18.55k £15.80k £22.63k
Income from government contracts N/A £620 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.02k £10.00k £2.67k £3.31k £1.62k