Trustees BRATTON FLEMING VILLAGE HALL
Charity Number: 300777

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Terrance James Shapland | Chair | 09 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Henrietta Clay | Trustee | 05 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Lawrence | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kirstie Cochrane | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Veronika Boumova | Trustee | 09 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Ayrton | Trustee | 09 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Emma May Louise Wythes | Trustee | 09 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mandy Elizabeth Robbins | Trustee | 11 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Fraser Dickson | Trustee | 17 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lizzie Bethune | Trustee | 21 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Tapp | Trustee | 15 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
ELSIE WILMETTS | Trustee | 16 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
MRS L SHAPLAND | Trustee | 02 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE TYAS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.