THE QUEEN'S OWN DORSET YEOMANRY AND DORSET GARRISON CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
(1) Promoting the welfare of serving and former territorial soldiers through benevolent grants (2) Educating the public by preserving and displaying artefacts relating to the history of the Yeomanry (3) Promoting the welfare of serving territorial soldiers with sporting and social activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Dorset
Governance
- 28 October 1999: Standard registration
- CHARITIES I.C.W QUEENS OWN DORSET YEOMANRY + DORSET GARRISON (Previous name)
- Investment
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lieutenant General Arundell David Leakey CMG CBE | Chair | 20 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Michael Adams | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Captain Retired Allan James Wood | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian Thomas Griffiths | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Judi Roberts | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
LT COL SIMON WALTON LEDGER | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Paul Plumb | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Colin Albert Parr MBE | Trustee | 24 October 2013 |
|
|||||
CAPT THE VISCOUNT FITZHARRIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.82k | £3.92k | £3.11k | £3.13k | £3.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.35k | £2.25k | £5.27k | £2.60k | £2.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 22 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 09 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 08 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 4 SEPTEMBER 1996 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 15 FEBRUARY 1999 AND AMENDED BY RESOLUTIONS DATED 24 AUGUST 2000, 18 NOVEMBER 2001, 31 AUGUST 2006 AND 7 SEPTEMBER 2009.
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE INCOME AND AT THEIR DISCRETION THE WHOLE OR PART OF THE CAPITAL AND THE PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY IN ALL OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS:- 1) SO FAR AS REQUISITE IN OR TOWARDS HOUSING, SAFEKEEPING, DISPLAYING, REPAIRING OR REPLACING THE CHATTELS BELONGING TO THE CHARITY AND THE COSTS OF INSURING THE SAME IN ACCORDANCE WITH TH PROVISIONS HEREINBEFORE CONTAINED. 2) IN RELIEVING EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP, OR DISTRESS, AND WHO ARE MEMBERS OR FORMER MEMBERS OR THE DEPENDANTS OF FORMER MEMBERS OF THE SUCCESSOR UNITS OR FORMER OR SERVING MEMBERS OR THE DEPENDANTS OF FORMER OR SERVING MEMBERS OF ANY REGIMENT OR SUB-UNIT OF THE REGULAR FORCES OR OF THE TERRITORIAL ARMY WHICH SHALL INCORPORATE IN ITS NAME OR DESIGNATION AND SHALL USE THE TITLE "QUEEN'S OWN DORSET YEOMANRY" OR "DORSET YEOMANRY" BUT IF THERE SHALL BE NO SUCH REGIMENT OR SUB-UNIT OF ANY REGIMENT OR SUB-UNIT OF THE REGULAR FORCES OR OF THE TERRITORIAL ARMY WHICH IS AT TIME STATIONED AND SERVING WITHIN THE COUNTY OF DORSET. 3) IN SUPPORTING OR PROMOTING THE EFFICIENCY OF ANY REGIMENT OR SUB-UNIT OF THE REGULAR FORCES OR OF THE TERRITORIAL ARMY WHICH SHALL INCORPORATE IN ITS NAME AND USE THE TITLE "QUEEN'S OWN DORSET YEOMANRY' OR "DORSET YEOMANRY" BUT IF THERE SHALL BE NO SUCH REGIMENT OR SUB-UNIT THEN OF ANY REGIMENT OR SUB-UNIT OF THE REGULAR FORCES OF THE TERRITORIAL ARMY, THE CADET FORCE OR THE COMBINED CADET FORCE WHICH IS AT ANY TIME STATIONED AND SERVING WITHIN THE COUNTY OF DORSET. 4) IN MAKING GRANTS TO SUCH CHARITIES CONNECTED WITH THE ARMED FORCES OF THE CROWN AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. 5) IN PURCHASING ARTEFACTS AND DOCUMENTS WHICH ENHANCE THE HISTORY OF THE QUEEN'S OWN DORSET YEOMANRY.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ramshill Farm
Manston
STURMINSTER NEWTON
Dorset
DT10 1HD
- Phone:
- 07775 440241
- Email:
- simon@simonledger.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window