Financial history STUDLAND VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 301185
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £23.85k £17.75k £9.33k £16.65k £17.28k
Total expenditure £24.97k £14.53k £11.57k £14.27k £15.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A