Trustees STUDLAND VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 301185

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHEN RUPERT SMITH | Chair | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Nelson Le Fevre | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Christopher Greville Stow | Trustee | 24 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas John Boulter | Trustee | 24 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Julie Kate Dyball | Trustee | 01 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
SALLY HOGSFLESH | Trustee | 09 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
MR JON BELLAMY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
REV ANTHONY HIGGINS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.