Trustees FERNDOWN DISTRICT GUIDES ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 301217

Charity reporting is overdue by 185 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SALLY WOODLEY | Chair | 17 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Kaye Jackson | Trustee | 09 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Karen Tether | Trustee | 18 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Fay Tsalatsanis | Trustee | 17 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
MICHELLE RENDELL | Trustee | 10 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
EMMA NATALIE GIDDENS | Trustee | 30 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
SUE DYER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOAN HOLT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KATHLEEN MARGARET BUTLER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.