Financial history WRITTLE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 301445
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £34.53k £57.32k £60.41k £56.56k £60.37k
Total expenditure £34.92k £45.31k £53.16k £48.89k £53.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £12.00k £3.67k £6.50k £2.00k N/A