EWSHOTT VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 301819
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide recreation facilities to the residents of Ewshot and the surrounding local areas.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £32,411
Total expenditure: £19,957

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Amateur Sport
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Hampshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 September 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Eleanor Mary Jennings Trustee 01 August 2022
None on record
AMANDA JAYNE HOPKINS Trustee 17 September 2013
None on record
MR ANDY CRANSTONE Trustee
None on record
CARYLL ANN MARTIN Trustee
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CRONDALL & EWSHOT
Received: On time
THE ALL SAINTS AND ST MARY'S CHARITY
Received: On time
MRS S D MERRIMAN Trustee
THE ALL SAINTS AND ST MARY'S CHARITY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £17.98k £8.03k £9.70k £15.45k £32.41k
Total expenditure £7.63k £8.61k £5.03k £37.97k £19.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A N/A N/A £15.07k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 11 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 11 May 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 02 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 17 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 11 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 16 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Ewshot Village Hall
Tadpole Lane
Ewshot
FARNHAM
GU10 5BX
Phone:
01252851136
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available