Financial history Sandon Herts Village Hall

Charity number: 302461
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £5.54k £10.61k £13.22k £6.28k £3.79k
Total expenditure £8.13k £2.22k £6.85k £4.70k £3.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £10.67k N/A N/A