Financial history CASTOR AND AILSWORTH VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 302632
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £14.51k £7.44k £9.51k £15.89k £26.31k
Total expenditure £11.31k £8.94k £8.84k £12.58k £22.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A