Financial history HIGHGATE HALL

Charity number: 302634
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £18.03k £21.17k £8.54k £7.19k £8.76k
Total expenditure £13.25k £4.79k £10.52k £11.21k £6.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £18.71k N/A N/A N/A