MANDEVILLE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Village Hall for the parishes of Kimbolton and Stonely providing space for a wide range of local groups and activities and for hire to residents of the parish and the surrounding area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 18 December 1969: Standard registration
- KIMBOLTON VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Wallace Richard Gray | Trustee | 09 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
KEITH HUTCHINSON | Trustee | 20 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Mavis Rosa Campion | Trustee | 11 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Rhodes | Trustee | 20 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
JEAN STRATFORD | Trustee | 12 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
Stanley Rhodes | Trustee | 27 April 2010 |
|
|
||||
JOAN CARPENTER | Trustee | 23 September 2004 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.13k | £35.03k | £30.21k | £38.61k | £32.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.46k | £13.79k | £24.08k | £28.03k | £33.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.33k | £17.37k | £2.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 15 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 15 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 30/05/1916 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 29/10/1969 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 14/06/2012
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF KIMBOLTON AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mandeville Hall
Thrapston Road
Kimbolton
HUNTINGDON
PE28 0HW
- Phone:
- 07367 783886
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window