Trustees TESTON VILLAGE GREEN, A PUBLIC PLAYGROUND

Charity number: 302860
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PETER RONALD COULLING Chair
TESTON LAND CONSERVATION TRUST
Received: On time
FRIENDS OF TESTON CHURCH
Recently registered
Benjamin Frank Merchant Trustee 02 May 2024
None on record
Robert Ayling Trustee 28 November 2023
TESTON VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
TESTON LAND CONSERVATION TRUST
Received: On time
Tina Yuen Burgon Trustee 24 January 2017
None on record
NINA MAY WHEAT Trustee 25 July 2013
FRIENDS OF TESTON CHURCH
Recently registered
TESTON LAND CONSERVATION TRUST
Received: On time
TESTON VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
CHRISTOPHER JOHN DOUGLASS Trustee 27 September 2012
None on record
JOHN ROBIN OWENS Trustee
TESTON LAND CONSERVATION TRUST
Received: On time