Governing document FASSNIDGE MEMORIAL TRUST

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 15 SEPTEMBER 1994, AS AMENDED BY SCHEMES DATED 15 MAY 2000, 1 AUGUST 2005 AND 22 OCTOBER 2008 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 03 JUN 2019 as amended on 11 Mar 2020 as amended on 30 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
THE FOLLOWING ORDER OF PRIORITY: (1) FOR THE BENEFIT OF OLD PERSONS RESIDING IN THE AREA OF THE FORMER URBAN DISTRICT OF UXBRIDGE; (2) FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH PERSONS RESIDING ELSEWHERE IN THE LONDON BOROUGH HILLINGDON; (3) FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE SAID LONDON BOROUGH.
Area of benefit
AREA OF THE FORMER URBAN DISTRICT OF UXBRIDGE, AND ELSEWHERE IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HILLINGDON.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.