Financial history WANSTEAD HOUSE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 303190
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £121.27k £115.40k £1.12m £132.19k £135.29k
Total expenditure £122.93k £114.36k £113.55k £124.73k £138.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £6.90k £7.11k £23.27k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £113.55k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A