FRIENDS OF THE PRIORY CHURCH CHRISTCHURCH DORSET

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To assist in repair and conservation of the Priory Church and its contents and generally to support the work of the church.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Dorset
- Hampshire
Governance
- 05 July 1997: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF CHRISTCHURCH PRIORY CHURCH (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joyce Davies | Trustee | 27 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Warren | Trustee | 26 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Trish Jamieson | Trustee | 26 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Avis | Trustee | 01 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Eileen Dibden | Trustee | 19 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jean Hewitt | Trustee | 19 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
HELEN CHRISTINE WESTLAKE | Trustee | 02 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
DIANE PEARL WRIGHT | Trustee | 03 October 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.80k | £3.00k | £4.31k | £17.14k | £14.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.06k | £36.57k | £4.44k | £20.84k | £141.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 15 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 FEBRUARY 1997. AS AMENDED ON 16TH OCTOBER 1997. as amended on 13 Apr 2021 as amended on 19 Feb 2022 as amended on 19 Feb 2022 as amended on 20 Feb 1997
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY ASSISTING IN THE REPAIR CONSERVATION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE FABRIC OF THE BUILDING AND ITS CONTENTS THE CHURCHYARD AND THE HISTORICALLY VALUABLE ARTEFACTS OF THE ANCIENT PRIORY CHURCH OF CHRISTCHURCH IN THE COUNTY OF DORSET
Area of benefit
DORSET
Contact information
- Address:
-
Priory House
Quay Road
CHRISTCHURCH
Dorset
BH23 1BU
- Phone:
- 01202 485804
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window