BROMLEY DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 303547
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Scouting actively engages and supports young people in their personal development, empowering them to make a positive contribution to society.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024

Total income: £189,810
Total expenditure: £179,502

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Bromley

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 June 1963: Standard registration
  • 28 November 2012: Funds received from 303558 ORPINGTON DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • BROMLEY BOY SCOUT LOCAL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Russell Kevin Zaple Chair 15 January 2012
GREATER LONDON SOUTH COUNTY SCOUT COUNCIL
Received: On time
Derrick SANYAHUMBI Trustee 23 September 2024
HELPING RHINOS
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH, BECKENHAM.
Received: On time
Jonathan Pownall Trustee 15 July 2024
BROMLEY MENCAP
Received: On time
23RD BROMLEY SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
Andrew Howard Trustee 15 July 2024
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH, ORPINGTON
Received: On time
Asif Malik Trustee 15 July 2024
None on record
Timothy Younge Trustee 15 July 2024
None on record
Gary Hurle Trustee 27 March 2023
None on record
Claire-Marie Hannam Trustee 02 September 2019
None on record
Sheila Howard Trustee 19 July 2017
None on record
MR LES DOBBS Trustee 15 January 2012
BROMLEY YOUTH TRUST
Received: On time
TERRY JAMES NEWMAN Trustee 15 January 2012
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £125.22k £115.32k £120.44k £409.70k £189.81k
Total expenditure £124.21k £48.75k £79.94k £173.50k £179.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £54.29k £33.59k £8.00k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 13 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 13 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2023 06 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 06 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2022 22 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 22 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2021 29 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 29 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2020 26 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 26 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Bromley District Scout Headquarters
15 Prospect Place
BROMLEY
BR2 9HL
Phone:
07834329741