Financial history THE MAURICE GLANVILLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1061537
Charity reporting is up to date (22 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £27.02k £42.58k £24.81k £29.56k £24.31k
Total expenditure £57.05k £42.77k £9.63k £10.06k £10.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A