Financial history VALEWAYS

Charity number: 1062031
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £15.00k £19.93k £22.32k £7.28k £6.53k
Total expenditure £23.23k £5.46k £22.34k £9.00k £7.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.16k £250 £5.20k £649 £325