Accounts and annual returns CARHAMPTON COMMUNITY ORCHARD

Charity Number: 1072570
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 05 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2023 05 August 2024 158 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2022 08 March 2023 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2021 10 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 14 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required