Financial history CARHAMPTON COMMUNITY ORCHARD

Charity Number: 1072570
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £1.71k £680 £1.14k £1.65k £1.39k
Total expenditure £1.09k £389 £1.13k £989 £1.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A