NEWQUAY MIND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Charity for people with Mental Health difficulties.We operate an open access service every afternoon from 1.30 - 4.00pm.We run several groups in the mornings such as Art & Craft, Yoga, Reiki and Auricular Acupuncture.We also run a Counselling service. We hold Training sessions frequently and we have an ongoing programme of in house training for social work students and the police.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cornwall
Governance
- 13 March 1997: Standard registration
- 22 November 2012: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 22 November 2012: Funds transferred to 1148097 PENTA HEALTH AND WELLBEING LTD
- NEWQUAY AND DISTRICT MIND (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £75.81k | £85.09k | £85.62k | £74.52k | £93.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £68.02k | £87.15k | £107.91k | £102.74k | £87.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 02 June 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 02 June 2012 | 123 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 31 January 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 13 July 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 21 September 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 25 September 2009 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/10/1988 AS AMENDED ON 18/11/2011
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION AND THE SAFEGUARDING OF MENTAL HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MENTAL DISORDER IN ASSOCIATION WITH MIND (NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR MENTAL HEALTH) IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE AIMS, OBJECTIVES AND POWERS OF MIND
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window