Financial history Forces Employment Charity

Charity number: 1061212
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £5.08m £5.44m £13.37m £7.59m £8.71m
Total expenditure £4.79m £5.10m £6.82m £9.49m £9.38m
Income from government contracts N/A £29.17k N/A £1.17m £2.21m
Income from government grants £58.64k £64.50k £198.03k £335.98k £64.89k
Income - Donations and legacies £754.69k £1.12m £188.96k £315.46k £202.40k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £4.33m £4.32m £6.31m £205.52k £8.28m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £975 £174 £58.35k £7.07m £230.06k
Income - Other £0 £0 £6.81m £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £1.12m £188.96k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.71m £4.93m £6.63m £9.31m £9.20m
Expenditure - Raising funds £75.00k £177.00k £192.31k £177.00k £180.00k
Expenditure - Governance £81.02k £84.59k £90.52k £89.39k £82.30k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £35.00k £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £12.31k £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0