3RD OSTERLEY GROUP SEA SCOUTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting the development of young people between the ages of 6 and 25 years and helping them achieve their full physical, intellectual, social and spiritual potentials by providing an enjoyable and attractive scheme of progressive training based in the Scout Law and Promise.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

15 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hounslow
Governance
- 27 February 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanna Elizabeth HALL | Chair | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elma Manuela Concepcion Bustamente-Dick | Trustee | 15 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN WALSH | Trustee | 24 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Wilkinson-Oakley | Trustee | 29 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Jane Baxter | Trustee | 29 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Boulton | Trustee | 29 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert Alan Kemp | Trustee | 08 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Liam Westley | Trustee | 24 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Leonard Parke | Trustee | 24 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Lawrence McGrandles | Trustee | 24 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER JAMES KLESEL | Trustee | 05 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Neil Everett | Trustee | 23 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Nigel RUSSELL | Trustee | 26 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
LOUISE BALE | Trustee | 02 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL THOMAS HEATH | Trustee | 25 March 1997 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £56.04k | £36.59k | £36.68k | £44.85k | £67.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.21k | £47.93k | £39.33k | £44.45k | £36.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £8.80k | £10.00k | £1.46k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 3 AUGUST 1951
Charitable objects
PURPOSES OF THE 3RD OSTERLEY GROUP OF SEA SCOUTS
Area of benefit
OSTERLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
3rd Osterley Sea Scouts
Richmond Road
ISLEWORTH
TW7 7BU
- Phone:
- 02085682101
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window