Financial history INSTITUTE OF FUNDRAISING

Charity number: 1079573
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £6.02m £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £6.23m £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £116.21k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £78.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £171.68k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £5.77m N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £2.67k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.97m N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £265.94k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £62.60k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A