Trustees INSTITUTE OF FUNDRAISING

Charity number: 1079573
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Bruce Tait Trustee 19 September 2024
None on record
Caroline Rand Trustee 19 September 2024
None on record
Jordan Miller-Hughes Trustee 19 September 2024
None on record
Monwara Ali Trustee 19 September 2024
None on record
Damian Chapman Trustee 19 September 2024
None on record
Harpreet Kaur Kondel Trustee 12 April 2023
CHARTERED INSTITUTE OF FUNDRAISING
Received: On time
Gary Kernahan Trustee 29 September 2022
None on record
Matthew Parkes Trustee 05 July 2021
CHARTERED INSTITUTE OF FUNDRAISING
Received: On time
Rebecca Mansell Trustee 05 July 2021
CHARTERED INSTITUTE OF FUNDRAISING
Received: On time
Sofia Zeenat Sheikh Trustee 01 July 2019
CHARTERED INSTITUTE OF FUNDRAISING
Received: On time