THE SHIPTON-UNDER-WYCHWOOD RECREATION FIELD AND VILLAGE HALL CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity operates the Village Hall and associated Recreation Field for the benefit of the community in and around the village of Shipton under Wychwood. It leases tennis courts to the Wychwoods Tennis Club and operates two football pitches for local children and young people. There is a gym. The hall is used throughout the day and in the evenings by a wide variety of clubs for young and old.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 25 February 1963: Standard registration
- RECREATION ALLOTMENT (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTOPHER FITZPATRICK | Chair | 28 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
Criag Satchwell | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Townsend | Trustee | 29 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Drainer | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Smith | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tim Yates | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Cornford | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Phillip Croxson | Trustee | 06 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Roger Wilkin | Trustee | 06 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
David van de Poll | Trustee | 31 May 2017 |
|
|||||
Carole Arnold | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
MR FRANK O'NEILL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTINE ELIZABETH HALLIDAY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £91.63k | £68.51k | £97.74k | £92.96k | £104.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £104.31k | £65.84k | £69.11k | £86.33k | £118.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.33k | £17.34k | £3.35k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 02 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
REGULATED BY SCHEME SEALED 21 APRIL 1995, AS AMENDED BY SCHEME SEALED 2 SEPT 1997 AND 21 AUGUST 2000.
Charitable objects
THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY INCLUDING ALL PAYMENTS FOR THE USE OF THE SAID LAND AND ALL DONATIONS FOR THE BENEFIT THEREOF SHALL BE PAID INTO A TRUST ACCOUNT AT SUCH BANK AS THE COMMITTEE SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME PRESCIBE
Area of benefit
TOWNSHIP OF SHIPTON-UNDER-WYCHWOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
New Beaconsfield Hall
Station Road
Shipton-Under-Wychwood
CHIPPING NORTON
Oxfordshire
OX7 6BQ
- Phone:
- 01993832216
- Website:
-
newbeaconsfieldhall.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window