HOLFORD VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Village Hall provision and maintenance for Holford and surrounding villages, Somerset. Supported by fund-raising activities. Available for hire to residents and local activity groups. Available to hire to appropriate commercial organisations and for public and private events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Somerset
Governance
- 20 May 1965: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Mew | Chair | 11 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Kathleen Campbell | Trustee | 14 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Lloyd Campbell | Trustee | 14 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Stephen Valentine Keirl | Trustee | 18 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Emily Heckscher | Trustee | 12 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANN ANDERSON | Trustee | 06 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Louise Clare Russ | Trustee | 09 May 2017 |
|
|||||
Maureen Young | Trustee | 23 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
Steven Gunner | Trustee | 06 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
VANESSA MCDONNELL | Trustee | 08 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL HARRIS | Trustee | 08 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
MARK KELLAWAY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £163.63k | £22.28k | £18.42k | £12.09k | £11.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.39k | £6.54k | £13.60k | £9.29k | £14.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £118.62k | £20.47k | £11.85k | £413 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 March 2024 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE DATED 15TH FEBRUARY 1965
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL.
Area of benefit
HOLFORD, STRINGSTON, DODINGTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Holford & District Village Hall
A39 Main Road
HOLFORD
Somerset
TA5 1RY
- Phone:
- 01278741280
- Website:
-
holfordvillagehall.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window